Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1223568

EP1223568 - Fringe-field filter for addressable displays [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.11.2007
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2008  [2008/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[2007/04]
Former [2002/29]For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Sheridon, Nicholas K.
101 Garland Way
Los Altos, California 94022 / US
 [2002/29]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/29]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02250115.908.01.2002
[2002/29]
Priority number, dateUS2001075753811.01.2001         Original published format: US 757538
[2002/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1223568
Date:17.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1223568
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1223568
Date:24.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G09F9/37
[2002/29]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/41]
Former [2002/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Streufeldfilter für angesteuerte Anzeigen[2002/29]
English:Fringe-field filter for addressable displays[2002/29]
French:Filtre à champ de dispersion pour des écrans d'affichages[2002/29]
Examination procedure14.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
31.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2006Fee for grant paid
04.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]GB1578460  (XEROX CORP) [A] * page 3, line 101 - page 4, column 31 *;
 [A]US5956005  (SHERIDON NICHOLAS K [US]);
 [A]US5392151  (NELSON WILLIAM E [US])