Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237396

EP1237396 - Component carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2006
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visteon Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 728
Parklane Towers East
One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn
Michigan 48126-2490 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Visteon Global Technologies, Inc.
Suite 728, Parklane Towers East, One Parklane Boulevard
Dearborn, Michigan 48126-2490 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ewers, Paul Simon
25 Albra Mead
Chelmsford, Essex CM2 6YG / GB
02 / Mangat, Rapinder
52 Priory Road
Dartford, Kent DA1 2BS / GB
03 / Guirauton, Pascal
7 rue Serge Launay
95370 Montigny les Cormeilles / FR
 [2005/25]
Former [2002/36]01 / Ewers, Paul Simon
25 Albra Mead
Chelmsford, Essex CM2 6YG / GB
02 / Rapinder, Mangat
52 Priory Road
Dartford, Kent DA1 2BS / GB
03 / Guirauton, Pascal
7 rue Serge Launay
95370 Montigny les Cormeilles / FR
Representative(s)McLean, Robert Andreas , et al
Dummett Copp LLP
25 The Square
Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]McLean, Robert Andreas , et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date02250476.524.01.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateGB2001000534303.03.2001         Original published format: GB 0105343
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237396
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237396
Date:07.01.2004
[2004/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237396
Date:06.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H05K3/30
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   PT [2004/44]
Former [2004/43]DE,  FR,  GB,  PT 
Former [2004/40]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bauteilträger[2002/36]
English:Component carrier[2002/36]
French:Support de composant[2002/36]
Examination procedure27.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
08.07.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.08.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR
04.12.2004Fee for grant paid
04.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.08.2004AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.08.2004
11.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
11.08.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR06.04.2005
PT08.09.2005
[2009/01]
Former [2006/14]PT08.09.2005
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0897204  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH05165049  ;
 [A]GB2107517  (MOLEX INC) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE29902762U  (SAMSON AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931014), vol. 017, no. 566, Database accession no. (P - 1629), [A] 1-14 * abstract *