Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236704

EP1236704 - Base for an electric heater and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2004  [2004/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microtherm International Limited
1 Arrowe Brook Road Upton
Wirral CH49 1SX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Microtherm International Limited
1 Arrowe Brook Road
Upton, Wirral CH49 1SX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Jackson, James David Joseph
53 James Road
Kidderminster, Worcestershire DY10 2TR / GB
02 / Mitchell, Matthew Benedict David
The Rockery, Smalldale
Radwell, Hope Valley S33 9JQ / GB
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Jackson, Derek Charles
Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard
Lower Town
Claines
Worcestershire WR3 7RY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Jackson, Derek Charles
Derek Jackson Associates The Old Yard Lower Town
Claines Worcester WR3 7RY / GB
Application number, filing date02250733.902.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateGB2001000392919.02.2001         Original published format: GB 0103929
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236704
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2002
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/14, C04B35/80, H05B3/48, H05B3/74, H05B3/14
[2002/36]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Isoliermasse für einen elektischen Heizkörper und deren Herstellung[2002/36]
English:Base for an electric heater and method of manufacture[2002/36]
French:Composition d'isolation pour un corps de chauffage electrique et son procédé de fabrication[2002/36]
Examination procedure05.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/01]
23.07.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/01]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.04.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
15.04.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.04.2003M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1022930  (CERAMASPEED LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12,15,17,18,20-23 * column 1, lines 1-16 * * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 13; figure 1; claims 1,6-13 * * figure 3 *;
 [X]WO0109057  (MICROTHERM INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,12-17,20-23 * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 4 * * page 7, lines 20-23 * * page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 15; figures 1-3,6,7; examples 1-18; claims 1-39 *;
 [Y]GB2256192  (MICROPORE INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-24 * page 2, paragraph L - page 3, paragraph 3RD; claims 1-6 *;
 [Y]EP0929205  (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-24 * column 5, lines 4-32; figures 1-4; claims 1-11 *;
 [Y]  "MICROPOROUS FUMED-SILICA INSULATION", NTIS TECH NOTES, US DEPARTMENT OF COMMERCE. SPRINGFIELD, VA, US, (19900601), ISSN 0889-8464, page 520, XP000149142 [Y] 1-24 * whole document *