Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237086

EP1237086 - Method and apparatus to migrate data using concurrent archive and restore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.05.2015
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.06.2015  [2015/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Teradata US, Inc.
2835 Miami Village Drive
Miamisburg, OH 45342 / US
[2008/32]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tarenskeen, Herbert J
3356 Laurashawn Lane
Escondido, CA 92026 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Huang, Chongguang , et al
Rouse IP Limited
11th Floor, Exchange Tower
1 Harbour Exchange Square
London E14 9GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/24]Huang, Chongguang , et al
Rouse IP Limited
11th Floor Exchange Tower
1 Harbour Exchange Square
London E14 9GE / GB
Former [2011/03]Andrews, Martyn Peter , et al
Rouse Patents 11th Floor, Exchange Tower 1 Harbour Exchange Square London
E14 9GE / GB
Former [2009/36]Hyden, Martin Douglas
Rouse Patents 1st Floor 228-240 Banbury Road Oxford
Oxfordshire OX2 7BY / GB
Former [2008/28]Williamson, Brian , et al
Williamson IP Law 4 The Courtyard Barnsbury Terrace Islington London
N1 1JZ / GB
Former [2002/36]Cleary, Fidelma , et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date02250936.812.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079614528.02.2001         Original published format: US 796145
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237086
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237086
Date:25.06.2008
[2008/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14, G06F17/30
[2008/26]
Former International [2002/36]G06F11/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/10]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Datenmigration mittels gleichzeitiger Archivierung und Wiederherstellung[2002/36]
English:Method and apparatus to migrate data using concurrent archive and restore[2002/36]
French:Méthode et outil pour la migration des données par archivage et restoration simultanée[2002/36]
Examination procedure29.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
30.12.2008Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.01.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
18.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/26]
17.02.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/26]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.09.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
26.04.2010Request for further processing filed
26.04.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
29.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
02.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
01.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
29.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
28.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 13
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[X]US6029178  (MARTIN JAMES L [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 2 * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 2 * * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 47 * * column 16, lines 54-67 * * column 25, line 20 - column 27, line 9 * * figures 1-30 *;
 [A]US5440727  (BHIDE ANUPAM K [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * column 1, lines 8-57 * * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 36 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 46 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5884328  (MOSHER JR MALCOLM [US]) [A] 1-22 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 53 * * column 4, line 41 - column 7, line 43 * * figures 1-13 *