Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236429

EP1236429 - Structural assembly comprising a structural member and a finishing element for use with a water resistant floor covering [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/36]Kit consisting of a structure, a water resistant floor covering material and a finishing element
[2005/15]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.02.2006  [2006/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DLP Limited
Unit L
Snugborough Trading Estate
Braddan (Isle of Man) IM4 4LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]For all designated states
DLP Limited
Unit L, Snugborough Trading Estate
Braddan (Isle of Man) IM4 4LH / GB
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Beldore Limited
Unit L, Snugborough Trading Estate
Braddan (Isle of Man) IM4 4LH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Lock, Graham Robin
Apartment 38, King Edward Bay Apartments
Onchan, Isle of Man / GB
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Higgins, Michael Roger
A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square Cheltenham
Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Higgins, Michael Roger
A.R. Davies & Co. 27, Imperial Square
Cheltenham Glos. GL50 1RQ / GB
Application number, filing date02250941.812.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateGB2001000397217.02.2001         Original published format: GB 0103972
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236429
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A47K3/30, E04B2/82
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2004/36]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bausatz mit einem Bauteil und einem Abschlussteil zur Verwendung mit einem wasserbeständigen Bodenbelag[2005/15]
English:Structural assembly comprising a structural member and a finishing element for use with a water resistant floor covering[2005/15]
French:Kit comprenant un élément structurel et un élément de finition à utiliser avec un revêtement de sol résistant à l'eau[2005/15]
Former [2002/36]Bausatz bestehend aus einer Struktur, einem wasserbeständigen Bodenbelag und einem Abschlussteil
Former [2002/36]Kit consisting of a structure, a water resistant floor covering material and a finishing element
Former [2002/36]Kit consistant en une structure, un revêtement de sol résistant à l'eau et un élément de finition
Examination procedure24.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
02.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/05]
05.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9219830  (PERLMAN MORTON [US], et al) [X] 1,5,8,12,13 * page 3, lines 14-32 - page 5, lines 3-23; figure 3 *;
 [X]US5159723  (BENEDICT RAY B [US]) [X] 1,8,9,13 * column 6, lines 13-20; figures 1,2A,2B *;
 [A]US3855642  (BLITCH W) [A] * column 4, line 31 - line 59 *