Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237174

EP1237174 - Electron source [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kuo, Huei-Pei
924 Old Town Court
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
02 / Birecki, Henryk
3001 Ross Road
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
03 / Lam, Si-Ty
3861 Kamp Drive
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
04 / Naberhuis, Steven Louis
35923 Blair Place
Fremont, CA 94536 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Powell, Stephen David , et al
Williams Powell Staple Court 11 Staple Inn Buildings
London, WC1V 7QH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Powell, Stephen David , et al
WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8AY / GB
Application number, filing date02251172.920.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079524027.02.2001         Original published format: US 795240
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1237174
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:H01J3/02, H01J1/304, H01J29/48, G11B9/10
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/21]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektronenquelle[2002/36]
English:Electron source[2002/36]
French:Source d'électrons[2002/36]
Examination procedure03.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
03.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/40]
18.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4500791  (BEISSWENGER SIEGFRIED [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 31 - line 47; figure 2 *;
 [X]JPH0887956  ;
 [X]JP2000294122  ;
 []US2001052469  (ITO FUMINORI [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041]; figure 7 *;
 [X]JP2001035354  ;
 [X]EP1069587  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * figures 9A-9E,10,4-17 * * column 12, line 7 - column 13, line 19 * * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 11 *;
 [XY]EP1037250  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 1, line 8 - line 15 * * figures 2,5,6 * * column 6, line 17 - line 27 * * column 6, line 50 - column 5, line 5 * * column 8, line 52 - column 9, line 9 * * figures 1A,1B,2 * [Y] 1,2,7;
 [Y]EP1003195  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,7 * figure 5 *;
 [X]EP0772218  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,8 * figures 1,2 *;
 [DA]US5557596  (GIBSON GARY [US], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, [X] 1-6,9,10 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, [X] 1,2 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, [X] 1,2,7 * abstract *