Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241176

EP1241176 - Purine derivatives for the treatment of ischemia [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.02.2007
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Deninno, Michael Paul, Pfizer Global Research
and Development, Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
02 / Masamune, Hiroko, Pfizer Global Research
and Development, Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
 [2002/38]
Representative(s)Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer
ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Hayles, James Richard , et al
Pfizer Limited Patents Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich
Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Former [2002/38]Hayles, James Richard , et al
UK Patent Department, Pfizer Limited, Ramsgate Road
Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB
Application number, filing date02251174.520.02.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateUS20010276411P16.03.2001         Original published format: US 276411 P
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1241176
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07H19/16, C07D473/34, C07D471/04, A61K31/7076, A61P9/10, // (C07D471/04, 235:00, 221:00)
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/38]
TitleGerman:Purinderivate zur Behandlung von Ischämie[2002/38]
English:Purine derivatives for the treatment of ischemia[2002/38]
French:Dérivés de purine pour le traitement de l'ischémie[2002/38]
Examination procedure02.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/38]
29.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/10]
12.10.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5688774  (JEONG HEAOK KIM ET AL) [DA] 1-11 * claim - *;
 [A]WO0023447  (MYERS MICHAEL R ;CHOI SLEDESKI YONG MI (US); PAULS HEINZ W (US); E) [A] 1-11 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9808855  (CV THERAPEUTICS INC ;LUM ROBERT T (US); NELSON MAREK G (US); PFIST) [A] 1-11 * claim - *;
 [PA]WO0123399  (MASAMUNE HIROKO ;PFIZER PROD INC (US); DENINNO MICHAEL PAUL (US);) [PA] 1-11 * claim - *