EP1241312 - Sensor for automatic doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | [2009/16] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohba, Hiroyuki, c/o Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | 02 /
Imuro, Yoshihiro, c/o Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | 03 /
Imanishi, Osamu, c/o Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | 04 /
Kurata, Mataichi, c/o Optex Co., Ltd. 7-5, Nionohama 4-chome Ohtsu-shi, Shiga-ken 520-0801 / JP | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1AG / GB | Application number, filing date | 02251245.3 | 22.02.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | JP20010051502 | 27.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001051502 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1241312 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1241312 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241312 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1241312 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/00, G08B13/181, G06T7/60 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
G01V8/10 (EP,US);
E05F15/43 (EP,US);
E05F15/73 (EP,US);
E05F2015/434 (EP,US);
E05F2015/767 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | E05F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Sensor für automatische Türen | [2002/38] | English: | Sensor for automatic doors | [2002/38] | French: | Détecteur pour portes automatiques | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE CEDES AG Kantonsstrasse 14 7302 Landquart / CH Opponent's representative Dobler, Markus, et al, et al Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg/Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.2006
ADMISSIBLE CEDES AG Kantonsstrasse 14 7302 Landquart / CH Opponent's representative Dobler, Markus, et al, et al Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | 29.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.06.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.03.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.04.2008 | 01.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.06.2008 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.12.2008 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.11.2005 | CY | 09.11.2005 | FI | 09.11.2005 | NL | 09.11.2005 | TR | 09.11.2005 | DK | 09.02.2006 | GR | 09.02.2006 | ES | 20.02.2006 | IE | 22.02.2006 | LU | 28.02.2006 | MC | 28.02.2006 | PT | 10.04.2006 | SE | 23.02.2008 | BE | 28.02.2008 | FR | 29.02.2008 | IT | 22.02.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/50] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
NL | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
FR | 29.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
SE | 23.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
CY | 09.11.2005 | ||
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
TR | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
IE | 22.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
LU | 28.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 10.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/44] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
MC | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
GR | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 09.11.2005 | |
FI | 09.11.2005 | ||
DK | 09.02.2006 | ||
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 09.11.2005 | |
ES | 20.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 09.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5581625 (CONNELL JONATHAN H [US]) [A] 1,2,4* abstract *; | [A]DE19522760 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US5692061 (SASADA KATSUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]US5793900 (NOURBAKHSH ILLAH REZA [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * abstract * | by applicant | JP2000320243 | Opposition | EP0853299 | DE29912572U | EP0853299 | - RETO LÜTOLF, "Diplomarbeit aus dem Wintersemester 1997/1998", ZURICH |