Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237252

EP1237252 - Magnet assembly for a motor and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2005
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 14.10.2009  [2009/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark, DE 19711 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Black & Decker Inc.
Drummond Plaza Office Park 1423 Kirkwood Highway
Newark Delaware 19711 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Agnes, Michael
723 Heston Lane, Bel Air
MD 21014 / US
02 / Ortt, Earl
103 Crafton Road, Bel Air
MD 21014 / US
03 / Wang, Ren H.
2 Barnaby Court, Timonium
MD 21093 / US
04 / Boyce, Allyn
13120 Fork Road, Baldwin
MD 21013 / US
05 / Verbrugge, Brandon
109 Willow Avenue, Towson
MD 21286 / US
06 / Zhang, Jiaqi
40 Silver Fox Court, Cockeysville
MD 21030 / US
07 / Du, Hung T.
5 Rolling Acre Way, Reisterstown
MD 21136 / US
08 / Walter, Richard T.
10 Fork Springs Court, Baldwin
MD 21013 / US
 [2005/01]
Former [2002/36]01 / Agnes, Michael
723 Heston Lane, Bel Air
MD 21014 / US
02 / Ortt, Earl
103 Crafton Road, Bel Air
MD 21014 / US
03 / Wang, Ren H.
2 Barnaby Court, Timonium
MD 21093 / US
04 / Boyce, Allyn
13120 Fork Road, Baldwin
MD 21013 / US
05 / Verbrugge, Brandon
109 Willow Avenue, Towson
MD 21288 / US
06 / Zhang, Jiaqi
40 Silver Fox Court, Cockeysville
MD 21030 / US
07 / Du, Hung T.
5 Rolling Acre Way, Reisterstown
MD 21136 / US
08 / Walter, Richard T.
10 Fork Springs Court, Baldwin
MD 21013 / US
Representative(s)Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker
Patent Department
210 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough
Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB
Former [2002/36]Bell, Ian Stephen , et al
Black & Decker UK 210 Bath Road
Berks, Slough SL1 3YD / GB
Application number, filing date02251261.025.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS20010271141P23.02.2001         Original published format: US 271141 P
WO2002US0502922.02.2002         Original published format: PCT/US02/05029
[2003/03]
Former [2002/48]US20010271141P23.02.2001
Former [2002/47]US20010271141P23.02.2001
Former [2002/36]US20010271141P23.02.2001
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237252
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237252
Date:06.11.2002
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1237252
Date:12.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:H02K1/17, H02K1/27, H02K23/04
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Magnetanordnung für einen Motor und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung[2002/36]
English:Magnet assembly for a motor and method of making same[2002/36]
French:Arrangement d'aimants pour un moteur et procédé de fabrication[2002/36]
Examination procedure21.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
17.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2004Fee for grant paid
27.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
TR12.01.2005
CY25.02.2005
IE25.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
PT12.06.2005
[2009/42]
Former [2008/23]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
GR12.01.2005
CY25.02.2005
IE25.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
PT12.06.2005
Former [2008/03]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
CY25.02.2005
IE25.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
PT12.06.2005
Former [2007/20]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
CY25.02.2005
IE25.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/23]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
IE25.02.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2006/14]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
MC28.02.2005
Former [2005/51]AT12.01.2005
FI12.01.2005
Former [2005/46]FI12.01.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2617344  (VALEO [FR]) [X] 1-35,72,73 * page 2, line 18 - line 22 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 17; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4973872  (DOHOGNE L RANNEY [US]) [X] 1-31,72,73 * column 3, line 4 - column 5, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [X]US4625392  (STOKES VIJAY K [US]) [X] 1-31,54-66,72-75 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 37; figure - *;
 [X]US4877986  (SHIMIZU YUZURU [JP]) [X] 1-35,54-66,72-75 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 40; figure - *;
 [X]US4954736  (KAWAMOTO TETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-35,54-66,72-75 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 37 * * column 6, line 19 - line 23; figure 2 *;
 [X]US3887826  (APOSTOLERIS THEODORE G) [X] 1-31,54-66,72-75 * column 3, line 1 - line 67; figure 1 *