Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1236450

EP1236450 - Apparatus for acetabular reconstruction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/36]A method and apparatus for acetabular reconstruction
[2004/39]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.09.2005  [2005/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOMET, INC.
Airport Industrial Park, P.O. Box 587
Warsaw, IN 46580 / US
[2002/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Gibbs, Phillip M.
2703 Jean Street
Winona Lake, Indiana 46590 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]Giles, Ashley Simon , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date02251273.525.02.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079217423.02.2001         Original published format: US 792174
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1236450
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/36]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Rekonstruktion der Hüftgelenkpfanne[2004/39]
English:Apparatus for acetabular reconstruction[2004/39]
French:Dispositif pour la reconstruction d'une acétabule[2004/39]
Former [2002/36]Methode und Vorrichtung zur Rekonstruktion der Hüftgelenkpfanne
Former [2002/36]A method and apparatus for acetabular reconstruction
Former [2002/36]Methode et dispositif pour la reconstruction d'une acétabule
Examination procedure26.02.2003Examination requested  [2003/18]
01.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/38]
22.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XP]WO0170141  (GIRARDIN PHILIPPE ;FIQUET ARNAUD (FR); MOULIN JEAN (FR); BAUCHU PH) [XP] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 13 * * figure 1 *;
 [XY]FR2775586  (TORNIER SA) [X] 1-6,28,29 * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 3 * * page 4, line 34 - line 36 * * page 5, line 6 - line 8 * * page 6, line 6 - line 47 * * figures 1,3,9,10 * [Y] 7-21;
 [Y]US5176711  (GRIMES JAMES B) [Y] 7-14,21 * column 2, lines 1-55 * * column 4, line 3 - line 40 *;
 [YA]US5702477  (CAPELLO WILLIAM N ET AL) [Y] 15-20 * figure 3 * [A] 30-55;
 [A]EP0551794  (ALLO PRO AG ;SULZER MEDIZINALTECHNIK AG (CH)) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US4936856  (KELLER ARNOLD) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]US5916268  (SANDOZ YVAN ET AL) [A] * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4133433  (S + G IMPLANTS GMBH) [A] * the whole document *