Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1237318

EP1237318 - A latch control for crossing clock domains [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL 01-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
Sun Microsystems, Inc.
901 San Antonio Road, M/S UPAL 01-521
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Greenstreet, Mark R.
210-2057 W. 3RD Avenue
Vancouver, British Columbia V6J 1L4 / CA
02 / Ebergen, Josephus C.
22 Gaviota Way
San Francisco, California 94127 / US
 [2002/36]
Representative(s)Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Former [2002/36]Freeman, Jacqueline Carol
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Application number, filing date02251484.804.03.2002
[2002/36]
Priority number, dateUS2001079866202.03.2001         Original published format: US 798662
[2002/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1237318
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1237318
Date:21.01.2004
[2004/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/12, H04L7/02
[2004/04]
Former International [2002/36]H04L7/02, G06F1/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/42]
Former [2002/36]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Latchsteuerung zur Überbrückung von Taktgebieten[2002/36]
English:A latch control for crossing clock domains[2002/36]
French:Controle de bascule pour passer des domaines d'horloge[2002/36]
Examination procedure02.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/33]
15.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.11.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
18.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/17]
27.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
27.08.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
27.08.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200605   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0534129  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 8 * * column 2, line 16 - line 44 * * figure 4 *;
 [X]US4039960  (CLARK JAMES MONROE) [X] 1 * column 1, line 24 - line 53 * * column 4, line 54 - line 57 * * figure 12 *;
 [A]US5952857  (SUZUKI TAKAAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 26 - line 32 * * column 4, line 55 - line 65 * * column 5, line 3 - line 8 * * column 9, line 3 - line 8 * * figure 1 *