Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239329

EP1239329 - A process for making a flexographic printing plate and a photosensitive element for use in the process [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company
Chestnut Run Plaza
974 Center Road
P.O. Box 2915
Wilmington, DE 19805 / US
[2016/02]
Former [2012/17]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19898 / US
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
1007 Market Street
Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fan, Roxy Ni
33 Quail Run
Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US
02 / Hackler, Mark A.
53 Stonehenge Drive
Ocean, New Jersey 07712-3343 / US
03 / Kannurpatti, Anankumar R.
33 Sandstone Drive
E. Windsor, New Jersey 08520 / US
04 / Lungu, Adrian
791 Darlingtond Drive
Old Bridge, New Jersey 08857 / US
05 / Taylor, Bradley K.
105 Macroom Avenue
West Chester, Pennsylvania 19382 / US
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Towler, Philip Dean
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2002/37]Towler, Philip Dean
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date02251567.006.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateUS20010273669P06.03.2001         Original published format: US 273669 P
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239329
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239329
Date:23.07.2008
[2008/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239329
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/095, B41C1/10, G03F7/34, G03F7/36, G03F7/09, G03F7/11, G03F1/00
[2004/28]
Former International [2002/37]G03F7/095, B41C1/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2009/14]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer flexographischen Druckplatte und lichtempfindliches Element zur Benutzung in dem Verfahren[2002/37]
English:A process for making a flexographic printing plate and a photosensitive element for use in the process[2002/37]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d un plaque flexographique et élément photosensible pour l utilisation dans le procédé[2002/37]
Examination procedure12.09.2008Examination requested  [2008/43]
24.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.03.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
26.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.02.2012Fee for grant paid
29.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.01.2013  17.07.2017  WITHDRAWN
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 [2017/34]
Former [2013/10]
Opponent(s)01  24.01.2013  30.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
05.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
10.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.12.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.02.2015Appeal received No.  T0372/15
22.04.2015Statement of grounds filed
30.10.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2019/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO0188615  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PX] 1,6,7,9,14-16,18,21,22,27,28,30,33,35-42,48,50 * page 10 - page 11 *;
 [X]JP2000056447  (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 51,53,54 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0036]; example 1 *;
 [A]EP0665471  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-54 * examples 1,2 * * page 4, line 7 - line 45; claim 1 *;
 [DA]EP0468666  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-54 * page 15, line 29 - line 33 *;
 [DA]US5015556  (MARTENS JOHN A [MN]) [DA] 1-54 * column 20, line 49 - line 57 * * column 25, line 16 - line 21 *;
 [A]EP0653684  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [A] 1-54 * example 7 *;
 [A]WO9614603  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-54 * page 5, line 10 - line 22 *;
 [A]EP0468667  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-54 * page 17, line 29 - line 32 *;
 [PA]WO0118604  (DU PONT [US], et al) [PA] 1-54 * page 10, line 5 - line 22 *;
 [PA]EP1170121  (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) [PA] 1-54 * example -; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0741330  (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-54 * example 1; claim - *;
 [A]EP0665469  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-54 * example 1 * * column 7, lines 31-43 *;
 [A]US3060024  (MARION BURG, et al) [A] 1-54 * example IX *;
 [A]US3060025  (MARION BURG, et al) [A] 1-54 * example IV *;
 [A]US5888701  (FAN ROXY [US]) [A] 1-54 * claim 1 * * example 1 *;
 [A]US5879861  (VAN DAMME MARC [BE], et al) [A] 1-54 * claim 1 * * example 1 *
by applicantUS5279697
 EP0017927
 US4806506
 US3927199
 EP0665471
 US4132168
 WO2000US24400