Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1239329 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1239329



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1225
30.10.2019 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
01.10.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.05.2018 Request for change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
20.07.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
20.07.2017 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 1
17.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
17.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
17.07.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
11.12.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
01.12.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 10
18.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
14.09.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
14.09.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 52
04.05.2015 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
27.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 19
27.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
27.04.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
27.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 65
22.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 106
10.04.2015 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Appeal 1
07.04.2015 Request for change of address - applicant Appeal 3
23.03.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
27.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.02.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
20.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
20.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
20.02.2015 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
30.12.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.12.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.12.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
12.12.2014 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
12.12.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
12.12.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
10.12.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.12.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 36
21.11.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.10.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
17.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.10.2014 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
17.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 5
17.10.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.10.2014 Main request during Opposition procedure Opposition 8
17.10.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
17.10.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
23.09.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
17.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
17.09.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
16.05.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.05.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.05.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.09.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
16.09.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
16.09.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
16.09.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 17
18.07.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2013 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
12.07.2013 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 2
05.03.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.03.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
04.02.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.01.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 36
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.01.2013 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
24.01.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 49
24.01.2013 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 36
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
24.01.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.03.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.03.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.03.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
02.03.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
29.02.2012 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
29.02.2012 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
29.02.2012 German translation of the claims Search / examination 8
29.02.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.10.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
25.10.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.10.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 64
11.10.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
12.09.2011 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
09.09.2011 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
09.03.2010 Description Search / examination 32
09.03.2010 Priority document Search / examination 22
09.03.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
05.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 3
05.03.2010 Description Search / examination 32
05.03.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
08.01.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.01.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
04.01.2010 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.08.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
26.08.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.06.2009 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
03.03.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
12.09.2008 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
25.07.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.06.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.06.2008 European search report Search / examination 8
17.06.2008 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
17.03.2008 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
17.12.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
26.06.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
14.11.2006 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
06.07.2006 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
17.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
15.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
16.01.2006 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
09.01.2006 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
06.10.2005 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
19.07.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
16.07.2004 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
31.07.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
27.03.2002 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
27.03.2002 Priority document Search / examination 69
06.03.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2002 Claims Search / examination 8
06.03.2002 Description Search / examination 56
06.03.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6