Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1239329


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.10.2019 New entry: Invitation to file observations in an appeal + time limit
23.05.2018 Change - representative
21.07.2017 Opposition withdrawn published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
11.12.2015 Change - applicant published on  13.01.2016  [2016/02]
23.04.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
25.02.2015 Change: Appeal number
24.02.2015 New entry: Appeal number
24.02.2015 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
10.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.05.2014 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
17.09.2013 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.07.2013 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
04.03.2013 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
01.02.2013 Opposition filed published on  06.03.2013  [2013/10]
23.03.2012 (Expected) grant published on  25.04.2012  [2012/17]
19.03.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
07.03.2012 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.10.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.03.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.03.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.01.2010 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.08.2009 First examination report
21.08.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.06.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
20.03.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.02.2009 Definitive list of designations published on  01.04.2009  [2009/14]
25.02.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
19.09.2008 Request for examination filed published on  22.10.2008  [2008/43]
20.06.2008 Publication of search report published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
21.03.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.03.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.03.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.05.2004 Change - classification published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
24.03.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.07.2002 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.09.2002  [2002/37]