Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1239178

EP1239178 - Reverse input blocking clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NTN Corporation
3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
NTN CORPORATION
3-17, Kyomachibori 1-chome, Nishi-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kurita, Masahiro, c/o NTN Corporation
3066, Aza Oyumida, Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie-ken / JP
02 / Yoshioka, Atsushi, c/o NTN Corporation
3066, Aza Oyumida, Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie-ken / JP
03 / Kawai, Masahiro, c/o NTN Corporation
3066, Aza Oyumida, Oaza Higashikata
Kuwana-shi, Mie-ken / JP
 [2002/37]
Representative(s)White, Duncan Rohan , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]White, Duncan Rohan , et al
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2002/37]White, Duncan Rohan , et al
Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
Application number, filing date02251610.807.03.2002
[2002/37]
Priority number, dateJP2001006523908.03.2001         Original published format: JP 2001065239
JP2001024223209.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001242232
JP2001024225809.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001242258
[2002/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1239178
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1239178
Date:02.10.2002
[2002/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1239178
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:F16D41/10, B60R1/076, B60R1/074
[2002/40]
Former International [2002/37]F16D41/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/26]
Former [2002/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Rückwärtsfahrende Sperrkupplung[2002/37]
English:Reverse input blocking clutch[2002/37]
French:Embrayage de blocage contre entrée en sens inverse[2002/37]
Examination procedure25.03.2003Examination requested  [2003/21]
03.04.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
04.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.05.2004Fee for grant paid
18.05.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04076428.4  / EP1457700
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
08.05.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
08.05.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0884494  (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [X] 1-26 * column 14, line 55 - column 17, line 47; figures 20-22 * [Y] 27-34;
 [X]US5896973  (HOCHMUTH HARALD [DE], et al) [X] 1-26 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9910132  (ATLAS COPCO ELECTRIC TOOLS [DE], et al) [X] 1-26 * figures 1,2; claims 1,9 *;
 [X]EP0370502  (RENTROP HUBBERT & WAGNER [DE]) [X] 1-26 * figures 1,3; claim 1 *;
 [X]EP0752360  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-26 * figure - *;
 [A]US4901831  (ITO KENICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 8 * figures 18,19 *;
 [X]US6132050  (SAKATA IKUO [JP], et al) [X] 27,28,34 * column 13, line 34 - column 14, line 5 *;
 [Y]WO0041914  (BRITAX RAINSFORDS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 27-34 * page 6 *