Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1241825

EP1241825 - Synchronization of digital data decoders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.02.2010
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.03.2010  [2010/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2005/09]For all designated states
Matsushita Electric Industrial Co. Ltd.
1006, Kadoma
Kadoma-city, Osaka / JP
Former [2002/38]For all designated states
Matsushita Communication Industrial UK Ltd.
Daytona Drive, Colthrop
Thatcham, Berks RG19 4ZD / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Harrison, Kenneth John
34 Chedworth Gate
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 1NE / GB
02 / Townsend, David Mark, c/o Matsushita Communication
Industrial UK Ltd., Daytona Drive, Colthrop
Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4ZD / GB
03 / Sherratt, Simon
Mannock Way
Woodley, Berkshire RG5 4XW / GB
 [2002/44]
Former [2002/38]01 / Harrison, Kenneth John
34 Chedworth Gate
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 1NE / GB
02 / Townsend, David Mark, c/o Matsushita Communication
Industrial UK Ltd., Daytona Drive, Colthrop
Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4ZD / GB
03 / Sherratt, Robert S., c/o Matsushita Communication
Industrial UK Ltd., Daytona Drive, Colthrop
Thatcham, Berkshire RG19 4ZD / GB
Representative(s)Dawson, Elizabeth Ann , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
235 High Holborn
London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/38]Dawson, Elizabeth Ann , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date02251675.108.03.2002
[2002/38]
Priority number, dateGB2001000649216.03.2001         Original published format: GB 0106492
[2002/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1241825
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1241825
Date:17.08.2005
[2005/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2005
ClassificationInternational:H04L7/04, H04B7/26
[2002/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2006/19]
Former [2002/38]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Synchronisierung von digitalen Dekodern[2002/38]
English:Synchronization of digital data decoders[2002/38]
French:Synchronisation de décodeurs numériques[2002/38]
Examination procedure06.02.2006Examination requested  [2006/14]
10.05.2006Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.06.2006Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
03.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/13]
09.11.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2010/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
30.03.2006AT   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006BE   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006CH   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006CY   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006DK   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006ES   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006FI   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006GR   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006IE   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006IT   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006LU   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006MC   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006NL   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006PT   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006SE   M01   Not yet paid
30.03.2006TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.200403   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2004
31.03.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0996237  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0990351  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [A]GB2347831  (NEC TECHNOLOGIES [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *