Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1243622

EP1243622 - Aqueous coating compositions comprising vinylamine polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.11.2007
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, PA 19106-2399 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/52]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Former [2002/39]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
100 Independence Mall West
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19106-2399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hermes, Ann Robertson
437 Edgewood Drive
Ambler, Pennsylvania 19002 / US
 [2002/39]
Representative(s)Kent, Venetia Katherine
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Kent, Venetia Katherine
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB
Former [2002/39]Kent, Venetia Katherine
Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd European Operations Patent Dept. Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon, CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date02251879.915.03.2002
[2002/39]
Priority number, dateUS20010277435P21.03.2001         Original published format: US 277435 P
[2002/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1243622
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1243622
Date:30.10.2002
[2002/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1243622
Date:27.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:C09D5/02, B05D7/26, C09D201/00
[2006/30]
Former International [2006/28]C09D5/02, B05D7/26, C09D201/00, C09D139/02
Former International [2002/39]C09D5/02, B05D7/26, C09D201/00, // (C09D201/00, 139:02)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   SE [2003/30]
Former [2002/39]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wässrige Beschichtungsmittelzusammensetzungen enthaltend Vinylamin-Polymere[2002/39]
English:Aqueous coating compositions comprising vinylamine polymers[2002/39]
French:Compositions de revêtement aqueuses contenant le polymère vinylamine[2002/39]
Examination procedure03.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/39]
19.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2006Fee for grant paid
09.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0409459  (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1,7-10 * page 3, line 4 - page 7, line 1; claim - *;
 [A]EP0632096  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1,8 *;
 [X]JP2000109746  (SK KAKEN CO LTD) [X] 1-7 * example 2; table 3 *