Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1248408

EP1248408 - Methods and apparatus for providing efficient password-authenticated key exchange [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MacKenzie, Philip D.
11 Carleton Court
Maplewood, New Jersey 07040 / US
 [2002/41]
Representative(s)Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway
Lucent Technologies NS UK Ltd 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/41]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr.
Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date02252083.722.03.2002
[2002/41]
Priority number, dateUS2001082722705.04.2001         Original published format: US 827227
[2002/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1248408
Date:09.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1248408
Date:27.11.2002
[2002/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1248408
Date:19.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/08
[2002/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/33]
Former [2002/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ausführung eines effizienten mittels Kennwort authentifizierten Schlüsselaustauschs[2002/41]
English:Methods and apparatus for providing efficient password-authenticated key exchange[2002/41]
French:Procédé et dispositif de réalisation efficace d'un échange de clé utilisant une authentification par mot de passe[2002/41]
Examination procedure12.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/41]
05.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2004Fee for grant paid
16.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[PDA]EP1134929  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PDA] 1,8-10 * abstract *
 [A]  BOYKO V ET AL, "PROVABLY SECURE PASSWORD-AUTHENTICATED KEY EXCHANGE USING DIFFIE-HELLMAN", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY - EUROCRYPT 2000. INTERNATIONAL CONF. ON THE THEORY AND APPLICATION OF CRYPTOGRAPHIC TECHNIQUES. BRUGES, BE, MAY 14 - 18, 2000. PROCEEDINGS, LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, BERLIN: SPRINGER, DE, (20000514), vol. 1807, ISBN 3-540-67517-5, pages 156 - 171, XP000896058 [A] 1,8-10 * page 163, paragraph L - page 164, line L; figures 1,2 *