EP1251402 - Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/43] | Lithographic apparatus | ||
[2007/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [2007/43] |
Former [2004/39] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 1110, Building 2 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baselmans, Johannes Jacobus Matheus De Kruik 1 5688 GG Oirschot / NL | 02 /
Engelen, Adrianus Franciscus Petrus Karel de Grotelaan 115 5615 SR Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Cramer, Hugo Augustinus Joseph Lisven 2 5646 HM Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Finders, Jozef Maria Haag 4 5509 NJ Veldhoven / NL | 05 /
Kohler, Carsten Poeierhei 12 5508 VL Veldhoven / NL | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02252340.1 | 28.03.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | EP20010303036 | 30.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01303036 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251402 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251402 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G03F7/705 (EP);
G03F7/706 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/29] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Lithographischer Apparat und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung | [2007/19] | English: | Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method | [2007/19] | French: | Appareil lithographique et méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/43] | Lithographisher Apparat | ||
Former [2002/43] | Lithographic apparatus | ||
Former [2002/43] | Appareil lithographique | Examination procedure | 16.04.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/25] | 01.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5444538 (PELLEGRINI JOSEPH C [US]) [A] 1,16* the whole document *; | [X]WO0031592 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1,16 * page 10, line 24 - line 28 * * page 20, line 23 - page 26, line 7 *; | [DX]US6115108 (CAPODIECI LUIGI [US]) [DX] 1-7,9,10,16-25 * column 3, line 9 - line 38 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 53 * * column 8, line 14 - column 10, line 22 * * column 12, line 24 - column 14, line 3 * * figure 15 * |