Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254967

EP1254967 - Improved plasma sprayed thermal bond coat system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  27.06.2014
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.2014Revocation of patentpublished on 30.07.2014  [2014/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2009/48]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Rigney, Joseph David
1097 Deerhaven Court
Milford, Ohio 45150 / US
02 / Weimer, Michael James
6607 Miami Trails Drive
Loveland, Ohio 45140 / US
03 / Nagaraj, Bangalore Aswatha
5196 Traverse Court
West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US
04 / Lau, Yuk-Chiu
22 Blue Spruce Lane
Ballston Lake, New York 12019 / US
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
GPO Europe
GE International Inc. The Ark
201 Talgarth Road
Hammersmith
London W6 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Szary, Anne Catherine , et al
London Patent Operation GE International Inc. 15 John Adam Street London
WC2N 6LU / GB
Former [2002/45]Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr. , et al
GE London Patent Operation, Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street
London WC2R 3AA / GB
Application number, filing date02252672.716.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS2001084250326.04.2001         Original published format: US 842503
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254967
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254967
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
[2009/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2002
ClassificationInternational:C23C4/02
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2003/30]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verbessertes plasmagespritztes Wärmedämmhaftungsschichtsystem[2002/45]
English:Improved plasma sprayed thermal bond coat system[2002/45]
French:Système amélioré de revêtement de barrière thermique de projection par plasma[2002/45]
Examination procedure06.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
13.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2009Fee for grant paid
02.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.04.2010  18.01.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kaiser, Axel
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2010/20]
Opponent(s)01  07.04.2010   
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Kaiser, Axel
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
02.02.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.08.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.11.2012Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.12.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
04.04.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/31]
Appeal following opposition20.02.2013Appeal received No.  T0479/13
22.04.2013Statement of grounds filed
04.04.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
02.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
02.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
02.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
02.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0992612  (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 41 - line 46; figure 2; claims 1-10 *;
 [A]JPH10317122  ;
 [A]DE4417384  (HANS LEISTNER GMBH SUEDD METAL [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0816526  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claims 9-15 *;
 [A]WO9400617  (TECHNALUM RESEARCH INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 15; example 1; claims 1,4,13-15 *;
 [A]US5238752  (DUDERSTADT EDWARD C [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6 * column 5, line 36 - line 48 * * column 6, line 3 - line 44; claim 12 *;
 [A]US5403669  (GUPTA BHUPENDRA K [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 2 - line 8 * * column 4, line 3 - column 5, line 50; claims 1,2 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [A] 1 * abstract *