Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1251352

EP1251352 - Reaction apparatus and its use in a method of analyzing biologically active substances [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  06.08.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.08.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2004  [2004/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nisshinbo Industries, Inc.
31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyo-cho 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]For all designated states
NISSHINBO INDUSTRIES, INC.
31-11, Nihonbashi Ningyo-cho 2-chome
Chuo-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Moriya, Shogo, c/o Nisshinbo Industries, INC.
R & D Center, 1-2-3 Onodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
02 / Kimura, Naoki, c/o Nisshinbo Industries, INC.
R & D Center, 1-2-3 Onodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
03 / Suzuki, Osamu, c/o Nisshinbo Industries, INC.
R & D Center, 1-2-3 Onodai, Midori-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
 [2002/43]
Representative(s)Tombling, Adrian George , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/43]Tombling, Adrian George , et al
Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date02252693.316.04.2002
[2002/43]
Priority number, dateJP2001011814617.04.2001         Original published format: JP 2001118146
[2002/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1251352
Date:23.10.2002
Language:EN
[2002/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1251352
Date:25.06.2003
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/543, B01J19/00, B01L3/00
[2003/26]
Former International [2002/43]G01N33/543
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/12]
Former [2002/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Reaktionsapparat und dessen Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Analyse von biologisch aktiven Substanzen[2002/43]
English:Reaction apparatus and its use in a method of analyzing biologically active substances[2002/43]
French:Appareil de réaction et son utilisation dans une méthode d'analyse des substaces avec une activité biologique[2002/43]
Examination procedure30.12.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/39]
21.04.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2004/39]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.02.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
03.02.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
03.02.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9900655  (IMMUNETICS [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 10, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 3; figures 1-5; claim 5 *;
 [X]US5545531  (RAVA RICHARD P [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - line 54; figures 3,4 *;
 [XY]US6037171  (LARSSON BOERG [CH]) [X] 1,3,6-8 * column 5, line 1 - line 43 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 9 * * column 11, line 7 - line 17; figures 1,1B,3A,3B * [Y] 2,4,5;
 [Y]US5622826  (VARMA RAJENDER S [US]) [Y] 2,4,5 * column 2, line 46 - column 5, line 16 *;
 [A]EP0776700  (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *;
 [A]US5843767  (BEATTIE KENNETH L [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 13, paragraph 3; figures 1A,1B,,2,4; example 6 *;
 [PX]US2001026917  (NERIISHI KEIKO [JP], et al) [PX] 1-7 * page 1, column R, paragraph 14 - paragraph 20 *