Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1355204

EP1355204 - Polytetrafluoroethylene film & manufacture of same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2011
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.04.2011  [2011/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JAPAN GORE-TEX, INC.
1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho Mitsu-gun
Okoyama-ken 709-2123 / JP
[2006/40]
Former [2003/43]For all designated states
W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC.
551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206
Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Oyama, Shinro, c/o Japan Gore-tex Inc.
1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho
Mitsu-gun, Okayama-ken 709-2123 / JP
02 / Kikukawa, Hiroyasu c/o Japan Gore-Tex, Inc.
1102-4 Kouchi, Mitsu-cho
Mitsu-gun, Okayama-ken 709-2123 / JP
 [2003/43]
Representative(s)Shanks, Andrew , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/43]Shanks, Andrew , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Application number, filing date02252775.819.04.2002
[2003/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1355204
Date:22.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1355204
Date:14.04.2004
[2004/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2004
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/20, B29C67/24
[2003/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2005/01]
Former [2003/43]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Polytetrafluorethylenfilm und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[2003/43]
English:Polytetrafluoroethylene film & manufacture of same[2003/43]
French:Film de polytétrafluoroéthylène et procédé de fabrication[2003/43]
Examination procedure28.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/48]
15.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
03.02.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
24.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/17]
09.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.04.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
19.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201009   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0136831  (YAMAMOTO KATSUTOSHI ;DAIKIN IND LTD (JP)) [A] 1,2 * page 7 *;
 EP1229259  [ ] (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD);
 [A]US4910559  (KUGE TSUKASA ET AL) [A] 1 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 2 * * column 7, line 43 - line 52 *;
 [A]US5907348  (OGASAWARA MASASHI ET AL) [A] 1 * column 23, line 50 - line 64 *;
 [A]JPH09166933  ;
 [A]WO9710102  (GORE & ASS) [A] 3,4 * page 6, line 37 - page 7, line 7 * * page 11, lines 13-25; claim 3 *;
 [X]US5026513  (HOUSE WAYNE D ET AL) [X] 4 * column 2, lines 1-11 *;
 [A]US5374473  (DELANEY III WILLIAM E ET AL) [A] 3,4 * abstract * * column 2, lines 19-47 *;
 [A]EP0106496  (GORE & ASS) [A] 4 * page 21, line 18 - page 22, line 16 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09166933 A 19970624 (KONICA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *