Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260275

EP1260275 - Pump assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.03.2005
Database last updated on 22.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2005  [2005/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hornbeam Ivy Limited
Braeside Works, Wesley Close Frome
Somerset BA11 1EA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Hornbeam Ivy Limited
Braeside Works, Wesley Close
Frome, Somerset BA11 1EA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Herring, William Peter
Lower Rudge Farm
Rudge, Somerset BA11 2QE / GB
02 / Lapham, Simon John
Tanner Cottage, Manor Farm
Frome, Somerset BA11 4JQ / GB
03 / Moore, James
2 Whatcombe Terrace
Frome, Somerset BA11 3SF / GB
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date02252982.026.04.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateGB2001001042927.04.2001         Original published format: GB 0110429
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260275
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
ClassificationInternational:B05B11/00
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/48]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Pumpenanordnung[2002/48]
English:Pump assembly[2002/48]
French:Système de pompe[2002/48]
Examination procedure01.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/19]
10.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200403   M06   Not yet paid