Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254717

EP1254717 - Manufacture of integrated fluidic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.09.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.02.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.03.2011  [2011/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dalsa Semiconductor Inc.
18 Airport Boulevard
Bromont, Quebec J2L 1S7 / CA
[2003/03]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
Zarlink Semiconductor Inc.
400 March Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 3H4 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Quellet, Luc
503 du Rubannier
Granby, Quebec J2L 2R8 / CA
02 / Tyler, Heather
347 Chemin de Gaspe
Bromont, Quebec J2L 2P3 / CA
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Harding, Richard Patrick
Marks & Clerk LLP
4220 Nash Court
Oxford Business Park South
Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Harding, Richard Patrick
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2002/45]Harding, Richard Patrick
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date02253016.629.04.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateUS2001084283627.04.2001         Original published format: US 842836
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1254717
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1254717
Date:31.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00
[2002/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/45]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von intergrierten fluidischen Vorrichtungen[2002/45]
English:Manufacture of integrated fluidic devices[2002/45]
French:Procede de fabrication des dispositifs fluidiques intégrés[2002/45]
Examination procedure14.04.2003Examination requested  [2003/24]
06.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2007Fee for grant paid
03.08.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.08.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
13.04.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
17.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
IE29.04.2008
LU29.04.2008
IT30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
[2011/13]
Former [2010/37]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
TR31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
IE29.04.2008
LU29.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2010/32]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
IE29.04.2008
LU29.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/33]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
CY31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
IE29.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/23]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
IE29.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2009/13]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
FI31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
GR01.02.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/51]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
MC30.04.2008
Former [2008/40]AT31.10.2007
BE31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
DK31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT31.10.2007
CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
PT31.03.2008
Former [2008/23]CH31.10.2007
LI31.10.2007
NL31.10.2007
SE31.01.2008
ES11.02.2008
Documents cited:Search[X]US5690841  (ELDERSTIG HAAKAN [SE]) [X] 1-5,41-43 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 57 *;
 [X]US6180536  (CHONG JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1,41 * column 6, line 42 - column 8, line 25 *;
 [A]US6136212  (MASTRANGELO CARLOS H [US], et al) [A] 1-46 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 38 *;
 [A]WO9215408  (HEINZE DYCONEX PATENTE [CH]) [A] 1-46 * page 11, line 1 - page 13, line 5 *