EP1254734 - Solder dross removal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states SENJU METAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 23 Senju-Hashido-cho Adachi-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogawa, Tadamichi, c/o Senju Metal Industry Co., Ltd 23, Senju Hashido-cho Adachi-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Makovski, Priscilla Mary BARKER BRETTELL 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253045.5 | 30.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010135087 | 02.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001135087 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254734 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/06, B23K3/08, B23K1/08, B23K1/20, C22B7/04, H05K3/34 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
C22B7/004 (EP,US);
C22B7/00 (KR);
B23K1/206 (EP,US);
B23K3/0646 (EP,US);
B23K3/08 (EP,US);
C22B25/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entfernung von Lotkrätzen | [2002/45] | English: | Solder dross removal apparatus | [2002/45] | French: | Appareil d'enlèvement de scories de brasure | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/45] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP2001234258 ; | [A]JPH06198426 ; | [A]US3687430 (SCHULZ HANS-PETER, et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [X]US3861660 (AMMANN PAUL R, et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 3, lines 11-62; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4003559 (KUWANO KIYOHARU, et al) [Y] 4 * column 1, lines 14-19 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 13; figure 2 *; | [X]US4456230 (MENENDEZ JUAN BLAS S [ES]) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, lines 33-41 * * column 4, line 37 - column 6, line 9; figures 1,6,8,9 *; | [XAY]DE19518580 (OSSINGER THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 55 * * column 5, lines 1-14; figures 1-1-3,5 * [A] 7 [Y] 4,6; | [YD]US6214218 (KAWASHIMA YASUJI [JP], et al) [YD] 6 * column 12, lines 28-60; figures 4-7 * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010412), vol. 2000, no. 25, & JP2001234258 A 20010828 (SENJU METAL IND CO LTD) [XP] 1,3,4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941021), vol. 018, no. 554, Database accession no. (M - 1691), & JP06198426 A 19940719 (YOKOTA KIKAI KK) [A] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * |