Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1254848

EP1254848 - Container closures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.05.2006
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.05.2008Change - representativepublished on 04.06.2008  [2008/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COPE ALLMAN PLASTIC PACKAGING LIMITED
Walton Road, Farlington Portsmouth
Hampshire PO6 1TS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/45]For all designated states
COPE ALLMAN PLASTIC PACKAGING LIMITED
Walton Road, Farlington
Portsmouth, Hampshire PO6 1TS / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Breach, John Anthony
15 Bereweeke Road Felpham
West Sussex PO22 7EG / GB
02 / Peters, Philip Anthony
66 Charlesworth Drive Waterlooville
Hampshire PO7 6AZ / GB
 [2002/45]
Representative(s)Lomas, Geoffrey Michael , et al
Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton
SO14 2AQ / GB
[2008/23]
Former [2002/45]Lomas, Geoffrey Michael , et al
Barker Brettell Medina Chambers Town Quay
Southampton, Hampshire SO14 2AQ / GB
Application number, filing date02253076.001.05.2002
[2002/45]
Priority number, dateGB2001001113605.05.2001         Original published format: GB 0111136
[2002/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1254848
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1254848
Date:31.03.2004
[2004/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:B65D51/18, B65D41/30, B65D51/24, B65D51/30, B65D55/02
[2004/01]
Former International [2002/45]B65D51/18, B65D41/30
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/52]
Former [2002/45]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Behälterverschlüsse[2002/45]
English:Container closures[2002/45]
French:Fermetures de récipient[2002/45]
Examination procedure29.09.2004Examination requested  [2004/48]
01.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
18.02.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/23]
10.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2006/23]
03.04.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
29.11.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
29.11.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200504   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US3035730  (WALKER PERCY G, et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 2, line 4 - column 3, line 9 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]WO9701486  (PEPSICO INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5186775  (CULLEN JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 5 - line 15 * * figures 1,3,11,12 *;
 [XA]US4421235  (MORIYA TAKEHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 44 - line 60 * * figures 12,13 * [A] 6