Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265242

EP1265242 - Information recording-reproducing apparatus, and information retrieval program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  20.04.2007
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.04.2007Refusal of applicationpublished on 23.05.2007  [2007/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / 0kajima, Takahiro c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Yasukura, Tsuneki c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
03 / Ohkubo, Hirotoshi c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
04 / Inoue, Hiroya c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
05 / Hasegawa, Akihide c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
06 / Azuma, Kenji c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02253247.709.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateJP2001017282007.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001172820
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1265242
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1265242
Date:06.08.2003
[2003/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, H04N5/445, H04N7/088
[2003/32]
Former International [2002/50]G11B27/10
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/18]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungs- und Wiedergabevorrichtung und Informationsgewinnungsprogramm[2002/50]
English:Information recording-reproducing apparatus, and information retrieval program[2002/50]
French:Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'informations, et programme pour le recouvrement d'informations[2002/50]
Examination procedure02.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/14]
12.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2006Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/21]
07.12.2006Date of oral proceedings
05.01.2007Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/21]
05.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1089560  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0025] - [0033] * [Y] 2-7;
 [XY]WO9728499  (AWARD SOFTWARE INTERNATIONAL I [US]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 12, line 8; figure 3 * [Y] 2-7;
 [A]JP2000224554  ;
 [X]US5689612  (ABE NOBUAKI [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 11, [A] 1-7 * abstract *