blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1265359 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1265359



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 100
11.04.2014 Closing of application Search / examination 2
09.01.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
05.07.2013 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
30.05.2011 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
02.12.2010 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
12.08.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
12.08.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
12.08.2010 Description Search / examination 3
12.08.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.04.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.04.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.02.2004 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.01.2004 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 2
07.01.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2003 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
30.10.2002 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
02.08.2002 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
26.06.2002 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
09.05.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
09.05.2002 Claims Search / examination 2
09.05.2002 Description Search / examination 17
09.05.2002 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.05.2002 Drawings Search / examination 7
09.05.2002 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6