blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1265359
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP4469515BGlobal Dossier 26.05.2010B2
JP2002368583 20.12.2002A
Priority number Date
JP2001171375 06.06.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1265359Global Dossier 18.02.2004A3
EP1265359 11.12.2002A2
Priority number Date
JP2001171375 06.06.2001
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6657482 02.12.2003B2
US2002186073 12.12.2002A1
Priority number Date
JP2001171375 06.06.2001