Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1265359

EP1265359 - Digital filter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
1-1, Shin-ogura
Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2011/01]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
1-1, Shin-ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 212-0031 / JP
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ohashi, Toru, Pioneer Corporation
Kawagoe Works, 25-1 Aza Nishicho, Yamada
Kawagoe-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
 [2002/50]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/50]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02253248.509.05.2002
[2002/50]
Priority number, dateJP2001017137506.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001171375
[2002/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1265359
Date:11.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1265359
Date:18.02.2004
[2004/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2004
ClassificationInternational:H03H17/04, H03H17/02
[2002/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/46]
Former [2002/50]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Digitales Filter[2002/50]
English:Digital filter[2002/50]
French:Filtre numérique[2002/50]
Examination procedure13.02.2004Examination requested  [2004/16]
07.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
09.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.04.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
12.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
18.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
11.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201312   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4912667  (RABINSTEIN RUDOLF [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 26 - line 57 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 49 * * figure 1 * [A] 2-7;
 [XA]EP0135024  (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 5 - line 27; figure 2 * [A] 2-7;
 [A]US5717726  (HERRMANN MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 10 - line 14 * * column 1, line 26 - line 34 * * column 1, line 50 - line 57 * * column 2, line 13 - line 18 * * column 2, line 64 - column 4, line 36 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5777909  (LEUNG KA [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 19 - line 59 * * column 2, line 27 - column 4, line 28 * * figure - *