Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1256801

EP1256801 - Piezometric ground water pressure sensing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Local Link International Limited
3D Discovery Bay Marina Club, Discovery Bay Lantau
Hong Kong SAR / CN
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]For all designated states
Local Link international Limited
3D Discovery Bay Marina Club, Discovery Bay
Lantau, Hong Kong SAR / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Typson, Julian Peter
3D, Discovery Bay Marina Club, Discovery Bay
Lantau, Hong Kong SAR / CN
 [2002/46]
Representative(s)Tanner, James Percival , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/46]Tanner, James Percival , et al
D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date02253313.713.05.2002
[2002/46]
Priority number, dateGB2001001149111.05.2001         Original published format: GB 0111491
[2002/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1256801
Date:13.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1256801
Date:05.11.2003
[2003/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.09.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/24, E21B47/06, G01L19/14, G01L9/00, G01L9/08
[2003/45]
Former International [2002/46]G01N33/24
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2004/31]
Former [2002/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Piezometrisches Gerät zur Messung des Erdbodenwasserdrucks[2002/46]
English:Piezometric ground water pressure sensing apparatus[2002/46]
French:Appareil piézométrique pour mesurer la pression d'eau dans le sol[2002/46]
Examination procedure06.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/07]
08.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2005/07]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
22.06.2004AT   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004BE   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004CH   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004CY   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004DE   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004DK   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004ES   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004FI   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004FR   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004GB   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004GR   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004IE   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004IT   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004LU   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004MC   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004NL   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004PT   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004SE   M01   Not yet paid
22.06.2004TR   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
22.06.2004M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4453401  (SIDEY ROGER [GB]) [X] 1-8 * column W *;
 [X]US5357486  (PEARCE RICHARD E [US]) [X] 1,5-8 * column W *;
 [A]US4052903  (THORDARSON PETUR) [A] 1-8 * column W *;
 [A]EP0705941  (ISKANDER KHALIL FAHMY [FR]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9735190  (ELBAGU MESS UND REGELUNGSTECHN [DE]) [A] 1,5-8 * the whole document *