Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1258307

EP1258307 - System and method of marking materials for automated processing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.2009
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Precision Automation, Inc.
12909 NE 95th Street Vancouver
Washington 98682 / US
[2008/44]
Former [2002/47]For all designated states
Precision Automation, Inc.
12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dick, Spencer B.
Precision Automation, Inc., 12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
02 / Malone, Douglas J.
Precision Automation, Inc., 12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
03 / Lankamp, Jan
Precision Automation, Inc., 12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
04 / Lee, David
Precision Automation, Inc., 12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
05 / Morgan, David A.
Precision Automation, Inc., 12909 NE 95th Street
Vancouver, Washington 98682 / US
 [2002/47]
Representative(s)Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Stainthorpe, Vanessa Juliet
Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield
S1 2JA / GB
Former [2002/47]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street
Leeds LS2 8DD / GB
Application number, filing date02253439.016.05.2002
[2002/47]
Priority number, dateUS2001086123117.05.2001         Original published format: US 861231
[2002/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1258307
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1258307
Date:15.02.2006
[2006/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1258307
Date:29.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2006
ClassificationInternational:B23D59/00, B23D47/04, B27B1/00
[2002/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2002/47]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Markierung von Materialen zur automatischen Verarbeitung[2002/47]
English:System and method of marking materials for automated processing[2002/47]
French:Installation et procédé de marquage de matériaux pour traitement automatique[2002/47]
Examination procedure03.08.2006Examination requested  [2006/37]
07.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
11.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.08.2008Fee for grant paid
14.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
25.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
16.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
CY29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
TR29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
IE16.05.2009
LU16.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
[2011/43]
Former [2011/21]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
IE16.05.2009
LU16.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/47]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
GR30.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
IE16.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/23]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
IE16.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
FR02.06.2009
Former [2010/21]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
IE16.05.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/08]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
CH31.05.2009
LI31.05.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2010/04]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
MC31.05.2009
Former [2009/39]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
IT29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/38]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
SE29.01.2009
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/34]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
DK29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/32]AT29.10.2008
BE29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/25]AT29.10.2008
FI29.10.2008
NL29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
PT30.03.2009
Former [2009/23]AT29.10.2008
ES09.02.2009
Former [2009/20]ES09.02.2009
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5960104  (CONNERS RICHARD W [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 10, line 7 - column 17, line 47; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]US4286880  (YOUNG ALLEN E) [Y] 1-23 * column 4, line 15 - column 13, line 23; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]US4682894  (SCHMIDT RICHARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-23 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 11; figure 1 *