Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1263237

EP1263237 - Quantizing unit setting apparatus and method, coding apparatus and method, and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.04.2008  [2008/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Harada, Seiji, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Tokorozawa Works, 2610 Hanazono 4-chome
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
 [2002/49]
Representative(s)Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables
Massetts Road
Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/49]Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Old College, 53 High Street
Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date02253552.021.05.2002
[2002/49]
Priority number, dateJP2001015607924.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001156079
[2002/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1263237
Date:04.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1263237
Date:02.01.2004
[2004/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/30, H04N7/50, H04N7/26, G06T9/00
[2004/01]
Former International [2002/49]H04N7/30, H04N7/50
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/39]
Former [2002/49]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Einstellung der Quantisierungsschrittweite, Kodierungsvorrichtung und -verfahren, Medium zur Informationsaufzeichnung[2002/49]
English:Quantizing unit setting apparatus and method, coding apparatus and method, and information recording medium[2002/49]
French:Dispositif et procédé d'adjustement de pas de quantification, dispositif et procédé de codage, support d'enregistrement d'information[2002/49]
Examination procedure07.06.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/34]
26.09.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/14]
13.11.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
03.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
18.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US5532940  (AGARWAL ROHIT [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column 11, line 14 - column 13, line 42 *;
 [X]EP1065881  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10 * column 25, line 1 - line 58 *;
 [A]GB2306832  (SONY UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * page 7, line 8 - page 10, line 4 *
 [A]  BARZYKINA E ET AL, "Image compression for facial photographs based on wavelet transform", COMMUNICATIONS, COMPUTERS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. 10 YEARS PACRIM 1987-1997 - NETWORKING THE PACIFIC RIM. 1997 IEEE PACIFIC RIM CONFERENCE ON VICTORIA, BC, CANADA 20-22 AUG. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970820), ISBN 0-7803-3905-3, pages 322 - 325, XP010244979 [A] 1-11 * page 324, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PACRIM.1997.619964