EP1269878 - Airtight waterproof slide fastener [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Corporation No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/39] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states YKK CORPORATION No. 1, Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Nobuhiro 11, Tsubokawashin Namerikawa-shi, Toyama-ken / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 02253654.4 | 23.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010182785 | 18.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001182785 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1269878 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1269878 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1269878 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/32 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
A44B19/32 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T24/2514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/10] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Luft- und wasserdichter Reissverschluss | [2003/01] | English: | Airtight waterproof slide fastener | [2003/01] | French: | Fermeture à glissière étanche à l'air et à l'eau | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 30.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2775012 (FRIEDRICH MULKA) [A] 1,3-5 * column 1, line 26 - line 37 * * column 1, line 61 - line 65 * * column 2, line 3 - line 27; figure 1; claim 6 *; | [A]US3114953 (GANDOLPH DOELTER) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 21 - line 25 * * column 1, line 46 - line 60 * * column 3, line 4 - line 18; figure 4 *; | [A]US4348789 (BROWN ROBERT H) [A] 1 * column 1, line 16 - line 27; figure 4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4658480 (MORIOKA KOITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 43 - line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2184781 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [A] 1* page 2, line 16 - line 27; figure 5 * |