Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1260828

EP1260828 - System for tracking an object [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.12.2004
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.02.2005  [2005/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acoustic Positioning Research Inc.
8526-109 Street, Suite 200 Edmonton
Alberta T6G 1E5 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]For all designated states
Acoustic Positioning Research Inc.
8526-109 Street, Suite 200
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 1E5 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Bauer, Will
7111 Saskatchewan Drive
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2A4 / CA
02 / Lozano-Hemmer, Rafael
3954 Parc Lafontaine, Apt. 1
Montreal, Quebec H2L 3M7 / CA
 [2002/48]
Representative(s)Grey, Ian Michael , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/48]Grey, Ian Michael , et al
Venner, Shipley & Co, 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date02253687.424.05.2002
[2002/48]
Priority number, dateCA2001234821224.05.2001         Original published format: CA 2348212
[2002/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1260828
Date:27.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1260828
Date:15.10.2003
[2003/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01S3/786, G01S3/781
[2002/48]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   GB,   IT [2004/28]
Former [2002/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Objektvervolgungssystem[2002/48]
English:System for tracking an object[2002/48]
French:Système de poursuite d'un objet[2002/48]
Examination procedure03.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/32]
16.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/05]
01.09.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/05]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.200403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0814344  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,18-22 * column A * * claim 1 * * page 21 * * figures 25,32 * [Y] 7,8,12;
 [XY]US5912700  (HONEY STANLEY K [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,10,11 * column A * * column 2 * * column 8 * * column 35 * * column 29 * * figures 7,24 * [Y] 7,8,12