Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1288950

EP1288950 - Information storage medium containing information for providing markup documents in multiple languages, apparatus and method for reproducing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/10]Information storage medium containing information for providing multi-language markup document, apparatus and method for reproducing thereof
[2008/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.10.2009
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.11.2009  [2009/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
[N/P]
Former [2008/49]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR
Former [2003/10]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Byung-Joon
207-404 Jugong Apt., 29 Wooman 2-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Ko, Jung-wan 315-401 Daewoo Apt., 956-2 Cheongmyung
Maeul 3-danji,Youngtong-dong,Paldal-gu,Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do, Republic of Korea, 442 470 / KR
03 / Chung, Hyun-kwon
104-906 Dongbo Apt., 45 Tanbeol-ri, Gwanglu-eub
Gwangju-gun, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Bak, Bong-gil
(502)91-179 Sadang 2dong, Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2003/37]
Former [2003/10]01 / Kim, Byung-Joon
207-404 Jugong Apt., 29 Wooman 2-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Ko, Jung-wan
103-201, Byucksan Apt., 488 Magpo-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Chung, Hyun-kwon
104-906 Dongbo Apt., 45 Tanbeol-ri, Gwanglu-eub
Gwangju-gun, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Bak, Bong-gil
(502)91-179 Sadang 2dong, Dongjak-gu
Seoul / KR
Representative(s)Brandon, Paul Laurence , et al
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/10]Brandon, Paul Laurence , et al
APPLEYARD LEES, 15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date02254067.811.06.2002
[2003/10]
Priority number, dateKR2001003249311.06.2001         Original published format: KR 2001032493
KR2001006494320.10.2001         Original published format: KR 2001064943
[2003/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1288950
Date:05.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1288950
Date:03.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2003
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, G11B27/32, G11B20/12, G11B19/02, G09B5/06, G06F17/30
[2003/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2003/48]
Former [2003/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Informationsspeichermedium, das Information zum Bereitstellen von Dokumenten einer Markierungssprache in mehreren Sprachen enthält, Gerät und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe dafür[2008/33]
English:Information storage medium containing information for providing markup documents in multiple languages, apparatus and method for reproducing thereof[2008/33]
French:Support de stockage d'informations contenant des informations pour fournir des documents markup en plusieurs langues, appareil et procédé pour reproduire de celui-ci[2008/33]
Former [2003/10]Informationsspeichermedium ,das Information zum Bereitstellen eines vielsprachigen Dokuments in einer Markierungssprache enthält, Gerät und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe dafür
Former [2003/10]Information storage medium containing information for providing multi-language markup document, apparatus and method for reproducing thereof
Former [2003/10]Milieu de stockage d'informations contenant des informations pour fournir un document en language de balisage multilangues, apparel et procédé pour reproduire de celui-ci
Examination procedure08.07.2002Examination requested  [2003/10]
10.09.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
05.01.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR
14.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2008Fee for grant paid
20.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.09.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
22.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.10.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.10.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0886276  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,13,14,17,18,21,22 * column 16, line 40 - column 18, line 10 * * column 26, line 16 - line 44 * [Y] 3,6,7,23;
 [YA]EP0762422  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 3,6,7,23 * column 18, line 35 - column 26, line 20; figures 23-28 * [A] 1,4,13,14,18,21,22;
 [A]US4899292  (MONTAGNA JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * column W *;
 [PA]WO0205104  (INTERACTUAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [PA] 1,2,4,5,13,14,17,18,21,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6047292  (KELLY ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * column W *;
 [A]WO0063915  (SPRUCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH11161663  ;
 [A]JPH11161663  (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]JP2000182359  ;
 [PA]US6259858  (ANDO HIDEO [JP], et al) [PA] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * abstract * * column 6, line 31 - line 67 * * column 8, line 40 - line 57 * * column 10, line 41 - column 12, line 18 *;
 [A]EP0863509  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990930), vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11161663 A 19990618 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000182359 A 20000630 (TOSHIBA CORP;TOSHIBA AVE CO LTD) [A] 1,4,13,14,17,18,21,22 * abstract *
ExaminationUS5548509
 WO0063915
by applicantEP0886276
 EP0762422