blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1271129

EP1271129 - Depth and concentration estimation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/51]For all designated states
GLAXO GROUP LIMITED
Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue
Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Micro Chemical Systems Limited
The Deep Business Centre
Hull HU1 4BG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Haswell, Stephen John
27 Hall Walk
Cottingham, East Yorkshire HU16 4RL / GB
02 / Fletcher, Paul David Ian
65 Marlborough Avenue
Hull, East Yorkshire HU5 3JR / GB
03 / Zhang, Xunli
35 Clumber Street
Hull HU5 3RH / GB
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Rice, Jason Neale, et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN 925.1)
980 Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/46]Rice, Jason Neale, et al
GlaxoSmithKline Services Unlimited 980 Great West Road Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Former [2003/01]Hartley, Andrew Philip, et al
Mathisen, Macara & Co The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham, Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date02254092.612.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateGB2001001559726.06.2001         Original published format: GB 0115597
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1271129
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1271129
Date:21.04.2004
[2004/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2004
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/00, G01N21/31, G01N21/53, G01N21/03
[2004/17]
CPC:
G01N21/534 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2003/01]G01N21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2005/06]
Former [2005/02](deleted) 
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schätzung von Tiefe und Konzentration[2003/01]
English:Depth and concentration estimation[2003/01]
French:Estimation de la profondeur et de la concentration[2003/01]
Examination procedure06.05.2004Examination requested  [2005/06]
22.10.2004Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.04.2005Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
17.01.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.11.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/40]
12.05.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/40]
Request for further processing for:13.11.2007Request for further processing filed
13.11.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.11.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
08.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
24.01.2005AT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005BE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005CH   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005CY   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005DK   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005ES   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005FI   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005GB   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005GR   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005IE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005IT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005LU   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005MC   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005NL   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005PT   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005SE   M01   Not yet paid
24.01.2005TR   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200403   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2004
30.06.200504   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2005
30.06.200908   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Licence(s)ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:DE FR
Licencee:The University of Hull
Cottingham Road, Hull
North Humberside, HU6 7RX / GB
Date:01.05.2007
[2007/25]
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0483117  (BIOTRACK INC [US]) [X] 17 * page 5, line 4 - line 52 * * page 9, line 9 - line 30 * * page 17, line 32 - line 57 * * page 22, line 19 - line 32; figures 1-5 * [A] 2,3,6,9-12,14,15,18,19,21,24,26,27 [Y] 1;
 [XAY]EP0634642  (KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU KK [JP]) [X] 17 * page 7, line 23 - page 10, line 34; figures 1,8,11 * [A] 2-7,9-13,18-22,24,25 [Y] 1;
 [YA]US5438417  (BUSCH GARLAND F [US], et al) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 1 - column 8, line 26; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-6,9-12,17-21,24;
 [A]WO9822803  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1,17* page 10, paragraph 3 - page 11, paragraph 4; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.