Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1271427

EP1271427 - Transaction terminal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2012
Database last updated on 17.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.07.2012  [2012/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2011/33]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kasasaku, Takami, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Gibbs, Christopher Stephen
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Gibbs, Christopher Stephen
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date02254285.620.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateJP2001019527027.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001195270
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1271427
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1271427
Date:09.06.2004
[2004/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1271427
Date:17.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2004
ClassificationInternational:G07F7/08, G06F1/00, G07F7/10
[2003/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/09]
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Transaktionsterminalvorrichtung[2003/01]
English:Transaction terminal apparatus[2003/01]
French:Dispositif de terminal de transactions[2003/01]
Examination procedure01.12.2004Examination requested  [2005/05]
24.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.11.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.06.2011Fee for grant paid
15.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination29.01.2007Appeal received No.  T0973/07
03.04.2007Statement of grounds filed
08.07.2010Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
08.07.2010Date of oral proceedings
26.07.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.03.2005
Opposition(s)21.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
29.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
26.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
27.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
29.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
29.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
29.06.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]US6065679  (HERMANSEN MICHAEL E ET AL) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 6 * * column 9, line 57 - column 10, line 53 * * column 14, lines 6-62 * * figure 7 *;
 [A]EP0248712  (DASSAULT ELECTRONIQUE) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1 - column 2 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0379333  (GRAVES MARCEL ALBERT) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 5, line 13 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0388571  (AMPER SA) [A] * the whole document *