blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1270065

EP1270065 - Apparatus for pressure and temperature measurements in tube reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.02.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.03.2011  [2011/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO., LTD.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
[2010/15]
Former [2003/01]For all designated states
Nippon Shokubai Co., Ltd.
1-1, Koraibashi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0043 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsumoto, Yukihiro
1-45-515, Goshikiyama 1-chome, Tarumi-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655-0035 / JP
02 / Nishimura, Takeshi
169-9, Kamigawara, Yobe-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1263 / JP
03 / Nakahara, Sei
448-1-509, Waku, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1227 / JP
04 / Kasaya, Naoto
1329-10, Okihama, Aboshi-ku
Himeji-shi, Hyogo 671-1242 / JP
 [2003/01]
Representative(s)Killin, Stephen James, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/01]Killin, Stephen James, et al
Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date02254415.925.06.2002
[2003/01]
Priority number, dateJP2001019313726.06.2001         Original published format: JP 2001193137
[2003/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1270065
Date:02.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1270065
Date:14.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:B01J8/06, B01J19/00
[2003/01]
CPC:
B01J8/067 (EP,US); B01J8/06 (KR); B01J8/001 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00044 (EP,US); B01J2208/00061 (EP,US); B01J2208/00212 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00513 (EP,US); B01J2208/00539 (EP,US); B01J2208/021 (EP,US);
B01J2208/025 (EP,US); B01J2219/00777 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR [2003/39]
Former [2003/01]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Druck- und Temperaturmessungen in Rohrreaktoren[2003/01]
English:Apparatus for pressure and temperature measurements in tube reactors[2003/01]
French:Appareillage pour effectuer des mesures de pression et de température dans des réacteurs tubulaires[2003/01]
Examination procedure09.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/28]
03.07.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
23.10.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR
27.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
29.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2010Fee for grant paid
26.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
16.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
19.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
18.06.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
17.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.08.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
07.08.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US3656914  (FRIEDRICHSEN WILHEIM, et al) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * column 1, line 55 - line 70; figure 1A *;
 [X]US4929798  (DE LASA HUGO I [CA]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 6, line 48 - line 60 * * column 7, line 50 - line 65 * * column 4, line 19 - line 37 *;
 [XDA]EP0873783  (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 13-16 * page 2, line 15 - line 25 * * page 2, line 15 - line 45 * * page 3, line 34 - line 54 * [A] 1-12;
 [XA]WO0017946  (CELANESE INT CORP [US]) [X] 13-16 * page 6, line 5 - line 21; figure 3 * * abstract * [A] 1-12;
 [A]EP1080780  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-16* abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.