blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1381090

EP1381090 - Wavelength detector apparatus and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.01.2009
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip02.01.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.02.2009  [2009/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd.
No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7
Singapore 768923 / SG
[2006/52]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. - a Delaware corporation -
395 Page Mill Road, P.O. Box 10395
Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Harker, Andrew
8 Camberley Road
Ipswich, Suffolk IP4 5QE / GB
 [2004/03]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/37]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Nußbaumstrasse 6
80336 München / DE
Former [2006/23]Schoppe, Fritz, et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Former [2004/03]Coker, David Graeme, et al
Agilent Technologies UK Ltd, Legal Dept, Eskdale Road, Winnersh Triangle
Wokingham, Berks RG41 5DZ / GB
Application number, filing date02254897.811.07.2002
[2004/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1381090
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2002
ClassificationIPC:H01L31/0232, G01J9/00
[2004/03]
CPC:
G01J9/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/41]
Former [2004/03]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Wellenlängenmessung[2004/03]
English:Wavelength detector apparatus and method therefor[2004/03]
French:Dispositif et procédé pour mesurer des longueurs d'onde[2004/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2004Examination requested  [2004/38]
02.04.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/06]
16.09.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2001290039  ;
 [X]EP0422854  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1,2,18-20 * column 5, lines 11-58; figure 4 *;
 [A]DE19633569  (INST PHYSIKALISCHE HOCHTECH EV [DE]) [A] 1,18 * abstract *;
 [A]US6185233  (MOOTHART MICHAEL R [US], et al) [A] 1,6,9* column 3, lines 3-40; figure 1 *;
 [X]WO0194896  (INDIGO PHOTONICS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-8,12-15,18-20 * pages 8-10; 20-22 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020402), vol. 2002, no. 02, & JP2001290039 A 20011019 (KDDI CORP) [A] 1,18 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.