Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1284194

EP1284194 - Controlling diffused-air bubbles in ink-jet print cartridges [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2007
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.11.2009Change - representativepublished on 16.12.2009  [2009/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [2006/26]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto
California 94304-1185 / US
Former [2003/08]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304-1185 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Deshmukh, Govind Sanjeevanrao
2187 Nw Kari Place
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
02 / Yliniemi, Carey
700 North Sacre Lane
Monmouth, OR 97361 / US
03 / Ronald, Robert
Blk. 8, No. 02-257, St Georges Lane Singapore
Singapore 320008 / SG
 [2003/08]
Representative(s)Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/51]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2003/08]Jackson, Richard Eric , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date02255517.107.08.2002
[2003/08]
Priority number, dateUS2001092971813.08.2001         Original published format: US 929718
[2003/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1284194
Date:19.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1284194
Date:28.05.2003
[2003/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1284194
Date:28.06.2006
Language:EN
[2006/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175
[2003/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2004/08]
Former [2003/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Steuerung von vermischten Luftblasen in einer Tintenstrahldruckpatrone[2003/08]
English:Controlling diffused-air bubbles in ink-jet print cartridges[2003/08]
French:Commande de bulles d'air diffusées dans des cartouches à jet d'encre[2003/08]
Examination procedure07.11.2003Examination requested  [2004/02]
12.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.03.2006Fee for grant paid
30.03.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.03.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US6042225  (ALTENDORF JOHN M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, line 38 - line 61; figures 4,6,7 *;
 [X]US5886721  (FUJII KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 7, line 27 - column 8, line 14; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0930169  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 7 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0645244  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1 * column 8, line 15 - line 54; figure 4 *;
 [X]DE19915925  (TALLY COMPUTERDRUCKER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 8; figures 1A,1B,2A *;
 [X]US5900898  (SHIMIZU EIICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,7 * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 34; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US6152560  (HOLLANDS PETER JOSEPH [NL]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 41 - line 56; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS5671001