Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1286264

EP1286264 - Device for task scheduling with priority levels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.09.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.11.2005  [2005/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/09]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza-Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nishimura, Kozo
1-19-3, Hitotsuya
Settu-shi, Osaka-fu 566-0043 / JP
02 / Owada, Kiyoshi
1-22-30-308, Kuzuha-co
Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573-1106 / JP
03 / Kuroda, Toyoharu
19-35-405 Suikouen-cho
Hirakata-shi, Osaka-fu 573-0095 / JP
 [2003/09]
Representative(s)Butcher, Ian James , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/09]Butcher, Ian James , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date02255578.309.08.2002
[2003/09]
Priority number, dateJP2001024218309.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001242183
[2003/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1286264
Date:26.02.2003
Language:EN
[2003/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1286264
Date:14.01.2004
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/46
[2003/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/41]
Former [2003/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Geräte für die Abfolgesteuerung von Aufgaben mit Prioritätsstufen[2003/09]
English:Device for task scheduling with priority levels[2003/09]
French:Appareil d'ordonnancement de tâches comportant des niveaux de priorité[2003/09]
Examination procedure09.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/19]
19.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/44]
06.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5745778  (ALFIERI ROBERT A) [X] 1,4-15 * column 1, line 61 - line 62 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 58 - line 62 * * column 6, line 8 - line 19 * * column 6, line 36 - line 41 * * column 7, line 14 - line 22 * * column 11, line 47 - line 50 * * figure 5B * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]WO0120446  (HONEYWELL INC) [Y] 2,3 * page 7, line 4 - line 6 * * page 9, line 6 - line 13 *;
 [A]EP0750255  (DATA GENERAL CORP);
 [A]  - KAWAKAMI I ET AL, "Real-time extension for windows NT/CE used for control systems", NPL, (20000726), pages 319 - 324, XP010527137