Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1286264
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.09.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.11.2005 [2005/44] |
01.06.2005 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.12.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
14.12.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
14.12.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
24.08.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2004 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
16.04.2004 |
First examination report |
|
14.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.03.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] |
28.11.2003 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
11.01.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |