Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1290995

EP1290995 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  14.04.2017
Database last updated on 19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 17.05.2017  [2017/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/35]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Uni-Charm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2003/11]For all designated states
Uni-Charm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Kawanoe-shi, Ehime-ken 182 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kondo, Hideki, Technical Center
1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho
Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
02 / Kudo, Jun, Technical Center
1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho
Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
 [2003/11]
Representative(s)Dolleymores
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/14]Eke, Philippa Dianne
Saunders & Dolleymore 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB
Former [2003/11]Parry, Christopher Stephen
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB
Application number, filing date02256177.306.09.2002
[2003/11]
Priority number, dateJP2001027581411.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001275814
[2003/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1290995
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1290995
Date:26.11.2003
[2003/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1290995
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/35]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.10.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/512, A61F13/537
[2003/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   SK,   TR [2003/11]
TitleGerman:Absorbierender Artikel[2003/11]
English:Absorbent article[2003/11]
French:Article absorbant[2003/11]
Examination procedure01.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/18]
13.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2009Fee for grant paid
06.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP09162304.1  / EP2090275
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.05.2010  28.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [2016/51]
Former [2012/33]
Opponent(s)01  24.05.2010  28.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2010/27]
Opponent(s)01  24.05.2010  28.05.2010  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Briatore, Andrea
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128 Sambuceto
I-66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
08.07.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.01.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.07.2012Date of oral proceedings
07.08.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.08.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.02.2017Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/20]
Appeal following opposition27.09.2012Appeal received No.  T2096/12
13.12.2012Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
23.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.03.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
09.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
24.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
05.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
TR26.08.2009
IE06.09.2009
LU06.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
[2015/21]
Former [2011/21]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
IE06.09.2009
LU06.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2011/14]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
IT26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
IE06.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/46]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
IE06.09.2009
CH30.09.2009
LI30.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
GR27.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/35]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
IE06.09.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/28]AT26.08.2009
BE26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/24]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
SK26.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/22]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
CZ26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/20]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
DK26.08.2009
EE26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
MC30.09.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/19]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
ES07.12.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/18]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
BG26.11.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/16]AT26.08.2009
CY26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
PT28.12.2009
Former [2010/09]AT26.08.2009
FI26.08.2009
Former [2010/08]AT26.08.2009
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9311726  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,13-15 * page 10, line 11 - page 34, line 19 * * page 56, line 29 - page 58, line 22; figure - *;
 [X]US4184902  (KARAMI HAMZEH [US]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * column W *;
 [X]EP0165807  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * page 11, line 19 - page 13, line 16; figure - *;
 [PX]WO0172251  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [PX] 1,2,15 * page 18, line 23 - page 20, line 25; figure - *;
 [X]US5533991  (KIRBY ROBERT E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,12-15 * column 6, lines 12-39 * * column 12, line 63 - column 13, line 23; figure - *