Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1302749

EP1302749 - System, method and program comprising information server apparatus and communication terminal apparatus for navigation using different transport means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2008
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.12.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 14.01.2009  [2009/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[2007/29]
Former [2003/16]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Watanabe, Tomo, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Sato, Tsuyoshi, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
03 / Oda, Tamami, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
04 / Saito, Yukitaka, c/o Pioneer Corporation
Sougou Kenkyusho, No. 6-1-1 Fujimi
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
 [2003/16]
Representative(s)Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables
Massetts Road
Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/16]Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road
Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Application number, filing date02256258.110.09.2002
[2003/16]
Priority number, dateJP2001027418410.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001274184
JP2001030436228.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001304362
[2003/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1302749
Date:16.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1302749
Date:17.12.2003
[2003/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1302749
Date:18.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2003
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/34, G08G1/0968, G01C21/26, H04Q7/38
[2003/51]
Former International [2003/16]G01C21/34, G08G1/0968
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/37]
Former [2003/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:System, Verfahren und Programm mit Informationsserver und Endgerät zur Navigation mit verschiedenen Transportmitteln[2003/16]
English:System, method and program comprising information server apparatus and communication terminal apparatus for navigation using different transport means[2003/16]
French:Système, procédé et programme comprenant serveur et terminal pour la navigation avec différents moyens de transport[2003/16]
Examination procedure04.06.2004Examination requested  [2004/32]
15.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2007Date of oral proceedings
09.02.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2007Fee for grant paid
12.04.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB18.10.2007
FR14.03.2008
DE01.04.2008
[2009/03]
Former [2008/36]FR14.03.2008
DE01.04.2008
Former [2008/32]FR14.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5760742  (BRANCH CHARLES N [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 6 * * column 10, lines 47-63 * * figures 1C,,2A-2C *;
 [Y]EP0520194  (NETWORK ACCESS CORP [US]) [Y] 1-29 * column 2, lines 56-58 * * column 3, lines 55-58 * * column 13, lines 4-23 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1130358  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 13-17 * column 3, lines 39-44 * * column 16, lines 17-32 * * column 20, lines 10-23 *;
 [A]US6026149  (FULLER ROBERT M [US], et al) [A] 1,10,18,23 * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 19 * * figure 1 *