Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1300817

EP1300817 - Navigation data providing system, server and navigation terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2007  [2007/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [2003/15]For all designated states
Pioneer Corporation
4-1 Meguro 1-chome
Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shioda, Takehiko, C/o Pioneer Corporation
Corporate Res. and Dev. Lab., 1-1 Fujimi 6-chome
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama / JP
02 / Yamauchi, Keiichi, C/o Pioneer Corporation
Corporate Res. and Dev. Lab., 1-1 Fujimi 6-chome
Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama / JP
 [2003/15]
Representative(s)Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/15]Haley, Stephen
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date02256395.116.09.2002
[2003/15]
Priority number, dateJP2001028619120.09.2001         Original published format: JP 2001286191
[2003/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1300817
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1300817
Date:02.07.2003
[2003/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1300817
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/00, G08G1/01
[2003/27]
Former International [2003/15]G08G1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/13]
Former [2003/15]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Navigationsdatenbereitstellungssystem, Server und Navigationsendgerät[2003/15]
English:Navigation data providing system, server and navigation terminal[2003/15]
French:Système pour fournir des données de navigation, serveur et terminal de navigation[2003/15]
Examination procedure29.12.2003Examination requested  [2004/10]
13.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2006Fee for grant paid
24.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE10024007  (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG) [Y] 1-6 * figure 2 * * column 2, lines 5-20,47-70 * * column 3, lines 4-20 * * column 4, lines 48-70 * * column 5, lines 10-26 *;
 [Y]US6282491  (VAHLE ANDREAS ET AL) [Y] 1-6 * figure 1 * * column 2, lines 60-65 * * column 3, lines 30-40 * * column 5, lines 45-50 * * column 6, lines 47-65 *;
 [A]WO0122633  (MOTOROLA INC) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,2 * * page 8, lines 10-30 *