blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1309125

EP1309125 - Method and system for determining availability in communication networks via transmission of monitoring packets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2003/19]Method and systems for determining availability in communication networks via transmission of monitoring packets
[2005/39]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2007  [2007/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2006/15]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St.Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Former [2003/19]For all designated states
Nortel Networks Limited
2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel
St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Lapointe, Darlene
38 Gillespie Crescent
Ottawa, Ontario K1V 9X8 / CA
02 / Lavigne, Martin
24 Rue des Estacades
Cantley, Quebec J8V 3J3 / CA
03 / Boskers, Karla R.
Appt. 19, 1160 Shillington Avenue
Ottawa, Ontario K1Z 7Z4 / CA
04 / Ashby, Frederic
25 de Deauville Appt. 6
Hull, Quebec J8Z 3C4 / CA
 [2003/19]
Representative(s)Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Limited
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/50]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2003/19]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan, et al
Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road
St Albans, Herts. AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date02257081.611.10.2002
[2003/19]
Priority number, dateUS2001098470031.10.2001         Original published format: US 984700
[2003/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1309125
Date:07.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1309125
Date:12.04.2006
Language:EN
[2006/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2003
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/26, H04Q11/04
[2003/19]
CPC:
H04L43/50 (EP,US); H04L41/5012 (EP,US); H04L41/5003 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/05]
Former [2003/19]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Bestimmung der Verfügbarkeit von Kommunikationsnetzen mittels der Übertragung von Überwachungspaketen[2005/39]
English:Method and system for determining availability in communication networks via transmission of monitoring packets[2005/39]
French:Procédé et système pour déterminer la disponibilité de réseaux de communication en transmettant des paquets de surveillance[2005/42]
Former [2003/19]Verfahren und Systeme zur Bestimmung der Verfügbarkeit von Kommunikationsnetzen mittels der Übertragung von Überwachungspaketen
Former [2003/19]Method and systems for determining availability in communication networks via transmission of monitoring packets
Former [2003/19]Procédé et systèmes pour déterminer la disponibilité des réseaux au moyen de transmission de paquets de surveillance
Examination procedure06.10.2003Examination requested  [2003/49]
31.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2006Fee for grant paid
10.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH1065685  ;
 [Y]US6058102  (DRYSDALE R SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 27 * * column 5, line 51 - column 7, line 42 * * column 12, line 5 - column 13, line 8 * * figure 1; table 1 *;
 [A]US2001002909  (IWAMOTO HIROYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-24 * paragraphs [0011] , [0124] * * figures 20,24 *;
 [Y]  - TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARDIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, "ITU-T Recommendation I.610", ITU-T TELECOMMUNICATION STANDARIZATION SECTOR OF ITU, GENEVA, CH, (19951101), page COMPLETE50, XP002085435 [Y] 1-24 * pages 11-16 * * pages 19-21 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10065685 A 19980306 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-24 * abstract *
 [A]  - OSMANI A ET AL, "Model-based diagnosis for fault management in ATM networks", ATM, 1999. ICATM '99. 1999 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COLMAR, FRANCE 21-23 JUNE 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990621), ISBN 0-7803-5428-1, pages 91 - 99, XP010346171 [A] 1-24 * page 92, paragraph 7 - page 93, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICATM.1999.786788
 [A]  - GRUBER J, "Performance and fault management functions for the maintenance of SONET/SDH and ATM transport networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS (ICC). GENEVA, MAY 23 - 26, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930523), vol. 3, ISBN 0-7803-0950-2, pages 1308 - 1314, XP010137101 [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 1310, column L - page 1314, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1993.397501
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.