blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1306370

EP1306370 - Dithiocarbamates containing alkylthio and hydroxy substituents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.07.2006
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip14.07.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.2006  [2006/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Afton Chemical Intangibles LLC
330 South Fourth Street
Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/36]For all designated states
Afton Chemical Intangibles LLC
330 South Fourth Street Richmond
Virginia 23219 / US
Former [2003/18]For all designated states
Ethyl Corporation
330 South Fourth Street, P.O. Box 2189
Richmond, Virginia 23218-2189 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gatto, Vincent James
13709 West Bay Drive
Midlothian, Virginia 23112 / US
 [2003/18]
Representative(s)Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. Kemp & Co.
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Cresswell, Thomas Anthony
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date02257421.425.10.2002
[2003/18]
Priority number, dateUS2001006216126.10.2001         Original published format: US 62161
[2003/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1306370
Date:02.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1306370
Date:07.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2003
ClassificationIPC:C07C333/20, C10M135/18, C10M135/22, C10N30/10
[2003/18]
CPC:
C10M135/24 (EP,US); C07C333/20 (EP,US); C10M135/18 (EP,US);
C10M135/22 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB [2004/04]
Former [2003/18]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Dithiocarbamate mit Alkylthio- und Hydroxysubstituenten[2003/18]
English:Dithiocarbamates containing alkylthio and hydroxy substituents[2003/18]
French:Dithiocarbamates contenants des substituents alkylthio et hydroxy[2003/18]
Examination procedure05.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
04.11.2003Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
12.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.03.2004Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.07.2005Fee for grant paid
11.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.12.2003AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003BG   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003CZ   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003EE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003SK   M01   Not yet paid
15.12.2003TR   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0349131  (ETHYL PETROLEUM ADDITIVES INC [US]) [A] 1-21*the whole document*;
 [X]FR2735130  (UNIV PICARDIE [FR]) [X] 1,6 * example 9 *;
 [X]  - LEN, CHRISTOPHE ET AL, "Synthesis and Antifungal Activity of Novel Bis(dithiocarbamate) Derivatives of Glycerol", J.AGRIC.FOOD CHEM., (1996), vol. 44, pages 2856 - 2858, XP002228721 [X] 1,6 *compound 4*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf950751y
 [X]  - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 88:74354, XP002228723 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [PX]  - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 137:127291, XP002228722 [PX] 1-4,6,16-21 * abstract *
    [ ] - KUBOTA, S. ET AL, "Synthesis and biological activity of 1,3-dithiol, 1,2-dithiolane and 1,3-dithiane-2-thione", JOURNAL OF THE FACULTY OF AGRICULTURE, KYUSHU UNIVERSITY, (1977), vol. 22, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 13
    [ ] - LATYUK, I ET AL, "1-Alkylthiopropanol-2-derivatives as multifunctional additives to lubricating oils", NEFTEKHIMIYA, (2002), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 145 - 149
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.