EP1315242 - Electrical interconnect assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLA Tencor Corporation 160 Rio Robles, MS:D-2000 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2003/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilmer, Dan L. 2620 Seiad Creek Road Seiad Valley, California 96086 / US | [2003/22] | Representative(s) | Wombwell, Francis Forresters 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/22] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 02257469.3 | 28.10.2002 | [2003/22] | Priority number, date | US20010996481 | 27.11.2001 Original published format: US 996481 | [2003/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1315242 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1315242 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/08, H01R12/16, G11B5/48 | [2003/22] | CPC: |
G11B5/4846 (EP,US);
H01R12/79 (EP,US);
H01R12/88 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/12] |
Former [2003/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsanordnung | [2003/22] | English: | Electrical interconnect assembly | [2003/22] | French: | Arrangement d'interconnection électrique | [2003/22] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.02.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.02.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.02.2004 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5733151 (EDSALL DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 7 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE19801173 (KENDALL MED ERZEUGNISSE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * column 2, line 47 - line 57 * * column 3, line 14 - line 16 * * column 3, line 33 - line 37 ** figures 1,2,6 *; | [XY]US6030243 (HARTING DIETMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - line 60 * * column 2, line 65 - line 67 * * column 3, line 8 - line 9 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,7; | [Y] - HIGH DENSITY FLEXIBLE CONNECTOR, IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, VOL. 32, NR. 7, PAGE(S) 344-345, ISSN 0018-8689, XP000078122 [Y] 2 * figure 1 * |