Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1322137

EP1322137 - Portable speaker systems and applications thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.07.2009
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 23.09.2009  [2009/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hosiden Besson Limited
St. Joseph's Close, 11 Hove
East Susseex BN3 7EZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Hosiden Besson Limited
St. Joseph's Close, 11
Hove, East Susseex BN3 7EZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Parmley, Charles Richard Colin
North House, 5 stair Road
Tonbridge, Kent TN10 4HB / GB
02 / Jupp, Steven David John
22 Harding Avenue
East Sussex, BN22 8SY / GB
 [2003/26]
Representative(s)Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables
Massetts Road
Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/39]Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
Former [2003/26]Townsend, Victoria Jayne , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Old College, 53 High Street
Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date02257673.006.11.2002
[2003/26]
Priority number, dateGB2001002660106.11.2001         Original published format: GB 0126601
GB2001002660206.11.2001         Original published format: GB 0126602
GB2001002660306.11.2001         Original published format: GB 0126603
[2003/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1322137
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1322137
Date:27.08.2008
[2008/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04R9/10, H04R1/02, H04R7/04
[2008/23]
Former International [2003/26]H04R9/10, H04R1/02
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/19]
Former [2003/26]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbares Lautsprechersystem und Verwendungen davon[2003/26]
English:Portable speaker systems and applications thereof[2003/26]
French:Système de haut-paleur portable et applications du même[2003/26]
Examination procedure28.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/35]
07.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4926486  (BARSUMIAN BRUCE R [US]) [X] 1-6,8,11-15 * the whole document * [A] 7,9,10;
 [XY]WO9834320  (NEW TRANSDUCERS LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8,11-13 * abstract * * page 5, line 26 - page 8, line 10; figures 1-5 * [Y] 15;
 [XY]WO0036875  (WHARFEDALE INTERNATIONAL LIMIT [GB], et al) [X] 14 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 9 * [Y] 15;
 [DX]WO9709842  (VERITY GROUP PLC [GB], et al) [DX] 1,2,9-15 * abstract * * page 54, line 15 - page 56, line 2; figure 10; claims 74,75 * * page 58, line 8 - line 25; figure 13; claim 73 * * page 69, line 19 - page 70, line 20; figure 27 *